+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading
- Third read: Failed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Senate first read
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Thorpe
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Thorpe Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Thorpe Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 15, 2014: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 2
February 12, 2014: Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 12, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1