+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Failed to pass
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On April 3, 2008 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Representative Kavanagh moved that notwithstanding any other rule, the House adopt a temporary rule to refer HB 2700 to the Committee on Appropriations. Motion carried by v/v.
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment: GOV - w/d
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to APPROP - Kavanagh
- Amendment: APPROP
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 25, 2008 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form on re-referral
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Kavanagh
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Kavanagh Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Substitute Floor amendment to the Appropriations Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
4-11 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 2, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 2
March 19, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form on re-referral (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
March 12, 2008: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
February 26, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 19, 2008: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (77)
Type:
Primary Sponsor