+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 165
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment substituted: ED
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to ED - Yee
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Yee SUBSTITUTE Floor amendment to the EDUCATION Committee amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Yee SUBSTITUTE Floor amendment to the EDUCATION Committee amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-8 ed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
March 28, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
March 6, 2012: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
March 5, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
January 30, 2012: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
January 30, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor