+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- COM (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:05PM.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
- Second read in House.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2021: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 60
April 13, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
March 17, 2021: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
February 11, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
February 1, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 10
February 1, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor