+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 189
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: NRRA (ref Bill)
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 4:00 pm
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Water and Agriculture: Do pass
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Water and Agriculture
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
4-2 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-26 nrra
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
May 3, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 4
April 18, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 3
March 19, 2007: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
March 13, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
February 6, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
February 6, 2007: Water and Agriculture: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor