+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WA
- Amendment: Floor Amend to WA - Ableser - w/d
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to WA - Mason #2
- Final disposition: Substituted Senate bill on third reading
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Water and Agriculture: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Water and Agriculture
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Water and Agriculture - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Mason Floor Amendment to the WATER AND AGRICULTURE Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Water and Agriculture - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Mason Floor Amendment to the WATER AND AGRICULTURE Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Water and Agriculture - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Water and Agriculture - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
February 5, 2007: Water and Agriculture: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor