+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:27PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 14
March 5, 2019: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 4, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 27
February 13, 2019: House Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 13, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor