+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 24, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 226
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 15, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On May 14, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: NRRA (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: O' Halleran flr amend (ref Bill)
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WA
- Amendment failed: Ableser #1 flr am to bill
- Amendment passed: Mason flr am to bill
- Third read: Passed
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Water and Agriculture: Do pass amended
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Water and Agriculture
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (14)
O'Halleran Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Water and Agriculture
House Adopted Amendment
Mason Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
O'Halleran Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 22, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 24
May 14, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
March 26, 2007: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
March 22, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
February 5, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 5, 2007: Water and Agriculture: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor