+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Shope flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by TRANS - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 9:55AM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 14, 2021: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 9
April 7, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 2, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 24, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 10
February 2, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 2, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor