+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 3:00PM.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- House Military & Veterans Affairs Committee: do pass amended.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military & Veterans Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 3, 2020: House Military & Veterans Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 3, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor