+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Failed to pass
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
3-14 trans
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2014: Transportation: Failed to pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 4
February 11, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2014: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor