+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Thorpe - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Technology Committee: do pass.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Technology Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 21, 2019: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 19, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 27
February 13, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 13, 2019: House Technology Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor