+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Gov
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:00 am
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 17
February 5, 2008: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 5, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor