+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- HB 2686 substituted for SB 1222. Motion carried.: PASSED
- First read in Senate.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Bowers - passed
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:13PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 13, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 10
February 12, 2020: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 23
January 22, 2020: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
January 22, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor