+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 12, 2014: Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 12, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor