+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass amended.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
Government and Higher Education
House Proposed Amendment
Government and Higher Education
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 10, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 10, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 10, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor