+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 22, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:30PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:05AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (5)
April 13, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
February 28, 2022: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 23, 2022: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 9
February 3, 2022: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 10
February 3, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor