+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 23, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 140
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 19, 2010 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 15, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 14, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CED (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref CED)
- Amendment failed: Harper flr amend (ref CED)
On April 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 30, 2010 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: GOV
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to GOV - Nichols
- Amendment failed: Flr Amnd to Nichols Sub Flr Amnd to GOV - Young Wright
- Amendment withdrawn: Amended by RULES - Nichols
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (13)
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Nichols Substitute Floor amendment to the Government Committee amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Nichols Substitute Floor amendment to the Government Committee amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-31 ced_strikermemo_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2010: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 5
April 14, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
March 25, 2010: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 22, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 2
February 9, 2010: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 9, 2010: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor