+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ugenti-Rita flr amend (ref COM) adopted
- COM (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Blanc - withdrawn
- SUB Floor Amend to Gov - Kavanagh - passed
- GOV
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass amended.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
May 15, 2019: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 18
May 6, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
March 12, 2019: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
March 11, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 19
February 13, 2019: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
February 13, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (59)
Type:
Primary Sponsor