+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 2, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 250 e
- Action: Signed
On May 27, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 22, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 11:39 am
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- House first read
+ − Amendment
3-7 trans-health
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
May 22, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 9
February 26, 2008: Health: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2008: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
February 18, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
February 4, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 4, 2008: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor