+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On August 1, 2023 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On July 31, 2023 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On July 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On July 31, 2023 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On June 14, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On June 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- MAPS (ref Bill) adopted
- Gowan flr amend (ref MAPS) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee: do pass amended.
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Amended by MAPS - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
July 31, 2023: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 56
June 13, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
March 20, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
March 20, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
March 20, 2023: Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 8, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 5
February 7, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 7, 2023: House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor