+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:31 pm
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 9, 2011: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 9, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor