+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Held
On April 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 30, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 30, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: HHS
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to HHS - Heinz
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Heinz Substitute Floor amendment to the Health and Human Services Committee amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 30, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
February 8, 2010: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
February 8, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor