+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 6
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter: 6
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- MISCELLANEOUS MOTION: HB 2670 substituted for SB 1468. Motion carried.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: APPROP
- Amendment passed: SUB Floor Amend to APPROP - Olson
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
SUB Floor Amend to APPROP - Olson - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 24, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 3
February 10, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2