+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 16, 2023 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On June 12, 2023 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On June 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On June 12, 2023 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On May 15, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- NREW (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass amended.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to NREW - Dunn - passed
- Amended by NREW - passed as amended
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
June 12, 2023: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 60
May 15, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
March 13, 2023: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 7, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
February 9, 2023: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
- Yeas: 10
February 9, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor