+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 215
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: HHS (ref Bill)
- Amendment withdrawn: GE (ref Bill)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Mach
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (11)
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Mach Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Mach Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-13 ge-hhs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
April 21, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
April 17, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2014: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
February 11, 2014: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 11, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor