+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Cobb - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
Floor Amend to Bill - Cobb - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 7, 2016: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 7, 2016: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
March 2, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
March 2, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 4
February 10, 2016: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
February 10, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2016: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 10, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor