+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Transmit to House.
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: Passed
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Allen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: withdrawn.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
Allen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (14)
May 7, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 1
May 7, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
May 6, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
May 6, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 7, 2016: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
March 7, 2016: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 7, 2016: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2016: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
March 2, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
March 2, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 10, 2016: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
February 10, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 10, 2016: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 10, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor