+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Final reading in House: PASSED
- House concurred.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- JUD (ref Bill) adopted
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- SUB Floor Amend to JUD - ALLEN - passed
- JUD
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 29, 2019: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 59
April 17, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 6, 2019: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 4, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
February 13, 2019: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
February 13, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor