+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 254
- Action: Signed
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:35 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment passed: HHS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
3-14 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
March 8, 2011: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
February 8, 2011: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 8, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2