+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Clark - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Petersen - passed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (4)
Floor Amend to Bill - Petersen - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Clark - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 11, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 11, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 11, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor