+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSHS (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Crandall flr amend (ref PSHS)
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Proud
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Technology and Infrastructure: Do pass
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Technology and Infrastructure
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Crandall flr amend (ref PSHS) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Proud Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Proud Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandall flr amend (ref PSHS) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-19 pshs_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 18, 2012: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2012: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 3
January 30, 2012: Technology and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 23, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor