+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Financial Institutions: Do pass
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 12, 2014: Financial Institutions: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 12, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor