+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: held.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:00PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2020: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 30, 2020: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 11
January 30, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor