+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 13, 2023 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: FAILED
On June 12, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On June 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- JUD (ref Bill) adopted
- Kavanagh flr amend (ref JUD) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On May 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: withdrawn.
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Amended by MAPS - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
June 13, 2023: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 31
June 12, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
March 6, 2023: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 28, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
February 7, 2023: House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 15
February 7, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor