+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Ge
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Senate first read
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Kavanagh
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 12, 2013: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 12, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor