+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 2, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Melvin flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment substituted: TI
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to TI - Vogt
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Technology and Infrastructure: Do pass amended
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Technology and Infrastructure
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (14)
Technology and Infrastructure
House Proposed Amendment
Melvin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Vogt Substitute Floor Amendment to the TECHNOLOGY AND INFRASTRUCTURE Committee Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure
House Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure
House Adopted Amendment
Vogt Substitute Floor Amendment to the TECHNOLOGY AND INFRASTRUCTURE Committee Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Melvin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-27 fin_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
4-5 fin_asvetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 28, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 1
March 22, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
March 5, 2012: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 4
January 25, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
January 25, 2012: Technology and Infrastructure: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7