+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 203
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:05 pmobject
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Gowan
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:31 pmobject
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Gowan Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-28 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
Gowan Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 13, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
March 16, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
March 15, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 4
February 8, 2011: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
February 8, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor