+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 4:13 pm
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2013: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
February 12, 2013: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 12, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor