+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 222
- Action: Signed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: HHS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment passed: SUB Floor Amend to HEALTH - Carter
- Amendment: HEALTH
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Health: Do pass amended
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health
House Proposed Amendment
SUB Floor Amend to HEALTH - Carter - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Health
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 30, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
March 24, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 23, 2015: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 19, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
February 11, 2015: Health: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
February 11, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor