+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 304
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Chabin
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:31 pmobject
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
3-17 jud_strikermemo_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-11 jud_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 4
April 13, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
March 8, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 4
February 7, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2