+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass.
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Amended by LARA - replaced by substitute
- SUB Floor Amend to LARA - Cook - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Sandoval - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 1:30PM.
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: withdrawn.
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee: do pass amended.
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 14, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 14, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 14, 2023: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 9, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
February 7, 2023: House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 7, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor