+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:30PM.
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: withdrawn.
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Votes (6)
March 13, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
March 13, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
March 13, 2023: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
March 9, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 13
February 7, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 7, 2023: House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1