+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Withdrawn
On April 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate second read
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 30, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 30, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2010 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to GOV - Hendrix
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Hendrix Floor amendment; reference to the Government Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Hendrix Floor amendment; reference to the Government Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 30, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 2
February 2, 2010: Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor