+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate members appointed to conference committee: UGENTI-RITA, LIVINGSTON, NAVARRETE
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- House members appointed to conference committee: BOLICK, BLACKMAN, TERÁN
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Ugenti-Rita flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- COM (ref Bill) adopted
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Bolick - passed
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:27PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- House Regulatory Affairs Committee: do pass.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Regulatory Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 17, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
March 12, 2019: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 11, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
February 12, 2019: House Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 12, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor