+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 151
- Action: Signed
On April 29, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 28, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:20 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On March 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate second read
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to WM - Murphy
- Amendment: WM
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Murphy Substitute Floor amendment to the Ways and Means Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Murphy Substitute Floor amendment to the Ways and Means Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
4-10 caucus-floor corrected
Senate Fact Sheet
4-7 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 28, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 4
March 24, 2008: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
March 19, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2008: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
January 31, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 31, 2008: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor