+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Gray motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass HB 2636 on Third Reading on May 15, 2019. Motion carried
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Livingston flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- RA - passed
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- House Regulatory Affairs Committee: do pass amended.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Regulatory Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
May 15, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 18
March 4, 2019: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
March 4, 2019: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 28, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 25
February 12, 2019: House Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 12, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor