+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 11, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 202
- Action: Signed
On May 7, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Gray L flr amend (ref PSHS)
- Amendment adopted: PSHS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Hershberger
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 11:00 amobject
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Human Services: Do pass
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Human Services
- House first read
+ − Amendments (11)
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Gray L Floor Amendment, reference to PSHS amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Hershberger Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
3-26 strikermemo caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Hershberger Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Gray L Floor Amendment, reference to PSHS amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-20 pshs strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
4-23 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
May 7, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
April 19, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
February 27, 2007: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 26, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
February 5, 2007: Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 5, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 10