+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:27PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
February 28, 2019: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 26, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
February 18, 2019: House Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor