+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 12, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 268
- Action: Signed
On June 9, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On May 28, 2008 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On May 21, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: PSHS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended
On March 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Transmit to Senate
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: HS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Government: Withdrawn
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Human Services - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Human Services - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Human Services - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
4-4 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Human Services - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-1pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
June 9, 2008: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
May 21, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 5
March 24, 2008: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 19, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2008: Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 31, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor